EP2099188 - Pattern detection circuit, base station and mobile communication system using the same, and pattern detecting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Kyoichiro NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Motoya NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003017.2 | 03.03.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | JP20080054237 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008054237 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2099188 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2099188 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP,US);
H04L27/14 (KR);
H04B17/00 (KR);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2017/03] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mustererkennungsschaltkreis, Basisstation und Mobilkommunikationssystem, das diese verwendet, und Mustererkennungsverfahren | [2009/37] | English: | Pattern detection circuit, base station and mobile communication system using the same, and pattern detecting method | [2009/37] | French: | Circuit de détection de motifs, station de base et système de communication mobile l'utilisant, et procédé de détection de motifs | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 16.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2005286409 (YOON SEOK-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0097] * * figures 2, 5, 7 * [A] 2-4,10-12[I] 5,6,13,14; | [XAI]EP1811691 (LG NORTEL CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 4, 9 * [A] 2-4,10-12 [I] 5,6,13,14; | [XAI]WO2007089199 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 21 - line 34 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 30 * * page 6, line 14 - page 8, line 2 * * page 10, line 10 - page 12, line 29 * * figures 1-4, 9, 10 * [A] 2-4,10-12 [I] 5,6,13,14; | [XAI] - Picochip, "An Overview of LTE PRACH Detection for the PC20x", CTO Office Technical Note, CTO-TN-0009, Beijing, China, (20080104), pages 1 - 12, URL: https://support.picochip.com/picochip-resource-folder/Nexu5utu/4598jf4897f/lte_prachdetection.pdf/download, (20131010), XP055083477 [X] 1,7-9 * page 5 - page 8 * [A] 2-4,10-12 [I] 5,6,13,14 | by applicant | JP2007259326 | JP2008054237 |