EP2098374 - Medium holding apparatus, image recording apparatus, and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Takashi Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
Fukui, Takashi Fujifilm Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker IP Patenanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003039.6 | 03.03.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | JP20080055054 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008055054 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098374 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098374 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B41J11/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/19] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medienhaltevorrichtung, Bildaufzeichnungsvorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2009/37] | English: | Medium holding apparatus, image recording apparatus, and image forming apparatus | [2009/37] | French: | Appareil de maintien de support, appareil d'enregistrement d'image et appareil de formation d'image | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 09.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6172741 (WOTTON GEOFF [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-23 * figures 1,2A,2B,5 * * column 1, line 14 - line 19 * * column 1, line 50 - line 61 * * column 2, line 34 - line 61 * * column 3, line 43 - line 56 * * column 6, line 13 - line 57 * * column 7, line 20 - line 34 *; | [X]US2005095046 (BEEHLER JAMES O [US]) [X] 1-3,9-23 * figures 2,3 * * page 2, column 23 - page 3, column 33 * * page 4, column 37 * * page 4, column 40 - column 42 *; | [X]GB2381241 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-23 * figure 5; claim - *; | [X]US2006181012 (KRUIJT PIETER G [NL]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2380163 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH10175338 | JPH10193718 |