EP2226650 - Optoelectronic sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch/Breisgau / DE | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauske, Maximilian R6, 15 68161 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Tanbourgi, Ralph Zähringerstrasse 19 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Waslowski, Kai Tiefmattenweg 5 79312 Emmendingen / DE | 04 /
Merettig, Gerhard Siedlungsweg 1 79350 Sexau / DE | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003109.7 | 04.03.2009 | [2010/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226650 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226650 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/10 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
G01V8/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Optoelektronischer Sensor | [2010/36] | English: | Optoelectronic sensor | [2010/36] | French: | Capteur optoélectronique | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2009 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | HR | 17.08.2011 | IE | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MK | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | NO | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | LU | 04.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 04.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4035710 (BETZ OLIVER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19926214 (BALLUFF GEBHARD GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]EP2015110 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0057]; figure 1 *; | [A] - O'FARRELL T ET AL, "Performance of a spread spectrum infrared transmission system under ambient light interference", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 1998. THE NINTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BOSTON, MA, USA 8-11 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980908), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-4872-1, pages 703 - 707, XP010314508 [A] 1-15 * page 703, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1998.734355 | by applicant | - HAYKIN, S., "Cognitive radar: a way of the future", SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE, (20060101), vol. 23 |