EP2072884 - Apparatus and method for filling fuel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Nippon Sanso Corporation 1-3-26 Koyama, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kazutoshi 16-7 Nishi-Shinbashi 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8442 / JP | 02 /
Takano, Naoyuki 16-7 Nishi-Shinbashi 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8442 / JP | 03 /
Omori, Kanji 16-7 Nishi-Shinbashi 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8442 / JP | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003135.2 | 24.09.2003 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | JP20020279230 | 25.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002279230 | JP20020291341 | 03.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002291341 | JP20020295151 | 08.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002295151 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072884 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/06 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F17C5/06 (EP,US);
F17C5/00 (KR);
F17C13/02 (KR);
F17C13/026 (EP,US);
F17C5/007 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0355 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0365 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0388 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0631 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0636 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0139 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y02P90/45 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einfüllen von Brennstoff | [2009/26] | English: | Apparatus and method for filling fuel | [2009/26] | French: | Appareil et procédé de remplissage de carburant | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03807908.3 / EP1593905 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02066884 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [XY]FR2769354 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5315831 (GOODE JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [X]FR2580779 (MICHIGAN CONS GAS [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1394105 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1466122 (LINDE AG [DE]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | - TECHNICAL GUIDELINE OF STANDARD AND SAFETY FOR COMPRESSED NATURE GAS, JURIDICAL BODY JAPANESE GAS ASSOCIATION, page 11 |