EP2103463 - Actuating device for an air outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röhm, Klaus Teckstrasse 1 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Messnarz, Dieter Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003151.9 | 05.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | DE20081014377 | 17.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008014377 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103463 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103463 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103463 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F24F13/14, B60H1/34 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B60H1/3414 (EP);
B60H1/00857 (EP);
F24F13/1426 (EP);
B60H2001/3471 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | B60H1/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/32] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stellvorrichtung für einen Luftausströmer | [2009/39] | English: | Actuating device for an air outlet | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif de réglage pour un diffuseur d'air | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE10244280 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1,10 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0080] * * abstract *; | [A]WO2008018268 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0067] * * abstract *; | [A]EP1721766 (MAIER S COOP LTDA [ES]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [DA]DE102005054295 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102005054295 | DE10244280 |