EP2104075 - Method and device for recording data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinbeis Interagierende Systeme GmbH Martinstr. 42-44 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states IT-Designers GmbH Entennest 2 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theissler, Andreas Eibenweg 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 02 /
Ulmer, Daniel Lauterstr. 30 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 03 /
Bühler, Oliver Trinkäcker 7 73271 Holzmaden / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Theissler, Andreas Forststrasse 52 72622 Nürtingen / DE | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003242.6 | 06.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | DE20081015352 | 22.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015352 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104075 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104075 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08, B60R16/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
G07C5/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB [2015/32] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen von Daten und Datenaufzeichnungssystem | [2009/39] | English: | Method and device for recording data | [2009/39] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement de données et système d'enregistrement de données | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10308972 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0040] * * figures 2,4 *; | [PX]DE102006056492 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PX] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] *; | [X]DE19546815 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 35 * * page 4, line 35 - line 46 * * claim 5 *; | [X]DE19933924 (LOHER AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 49 - line 51 * * page 3, line 3 - line 39 * * page 4, line 50 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 2 - line 44 *; | [X]EP1040974 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] *; | [DA]WO2005064546 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | DE10360125 | DE10308972 | DE102006056492 | DE19546815 | DE19933924 | EP1040974 |