EP2098444 - Handlebar grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chen, Jia-Pin No.51 Hengzun., St., Dajia Township Taichung County 437 / TW | For all designated states Chao, Kuo-Chin No.51 Hengzun., St., Dajia Township Taichung County 437 / TW | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003318.4 | 06.03.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | TW20080108158 | 07.03.2008 Original published format: TW 97108158 | TW20080117946 | 16.05.2008 Original published format: TW 97117946 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098444 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62K21/26 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B62K21/26 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Lenkergriff | [2009/37] | English: | Handlebar grip | [2009/37] | French: | Poignée de guidon | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1394033 (BATAVUS BV [NL]) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004089733 (GLOBAL MOTORSPORT GROUP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 31 - page 7, line 28; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1832318 (TILLIM STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1-11* figures 9A,9B * | by applicant | US2008072702 |