EP2100683 - End mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Yuji c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Kanegasakinishiooike Uozumi-machi Akashi-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Kitaura, Seiichiro c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Kanegasakinishiooike Uozumi-machi Akashi-shi Hyogo / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
Takagi, Yuji c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Kanegasakinishiooike Uozumi-machi Akashi-shi Hyogo / JP | ||
02 /
Kitaura, Seiichiro c/o Akashi Plant Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 179-1 Kanegasakinishiooike Uozumi-machi Akashi-shi Hyogo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003336.6 | 06.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | JP20080064190 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008064190 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100683 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100683 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B23C5/02 (KR);
B23C5/10 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/0485 (EP,US);
B23C2210/282 (EP,US);
B23C2210/40 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2010/20] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaftfräser | [2009/38] | English: | End mill | [2009/38] | French: | Fraise en bout | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 17.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004120777 (NOLAND DENNIS L [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPS62203710 (IZUMO SANGYO KK) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002067964 (SEKIGUCHI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3, paragraph 36; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPS6362323 | JPH0549408B | JPH07115254B | JPH0319004B | JP2007268648 | JP2000052127 | JP2001287114 | JP2002126934 | JP2004237366 |