EP2228049 - Dental composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply DeTrey GmbH De-Trey-Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klee, Joachim E. Espelweg 3/4 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
Brugger, Stefan Widerholdstr. 2 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 03 /
Ritter, Helmut Rotdornweg 37 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Weber, Christoph Händelstr. 1 78464 Kostanz / DE | 05 /
Elsner, Oliver Keltengasse 1 79790 Küssaberg / DE | 06 /
Bardts, Mareike Am Broichgraben 26 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
Facher, Andreas Hofackerstrasse 4 8543 Gundetswil / CH | 08 /
Pohle, Sven Markgrafenstrasse 30 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2016/45] |
Former [2010/37] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003393.7 | 09.03.2009 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228049 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228049 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
A61K6/54 (EP,US);
A61K6/889 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/54, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/889, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2016/45] |
Former [2011/20] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dentale Zusammensetzung | [2010/37] | English: | Dental composition | [2010/37] | French: | Composition dentaire | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 16.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0694298 (SHOFU INC [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-14 * page 6, lines 15-20 * * page 7, lines 23-29 * * page 8, lines 21-60 * * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 27 *; | [A]US6124491 (WOLTER HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15; | [X]EP1262530 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0016] , [0025] , [0027] , [0035] , [0049] - [0052] - [0085] - [0095]; claims 1-7 *; | [DA] - M.K. MARSCHÜTZ, A. BERNKOP-SCHNÜRCH, "Thiolated polymers : self-crosslinking properties of thiolated 450kDa poly(acrylic acid) and their influrence on mucoadhesion", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2002), vol. 15, pages 387 - 394, XP002535566 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-0987(02)00025-8 | Examination | US6281271 | by applicant | US3655605 | US3814717 | US4089830 | US4143018 | US4209434 | US4317681 | US4360605 | US4374936 | US4376835 | EP0323120 | US4872936 | US5063257 | US5130347 | US5154762 | US5227413 | US5367002 | US5369142 | US5520725 | EP0797975 | US5859089 | US5962550 | US5965632 | WO0005182 | US6124491 | WO0241845 | DE10058829 | DE10058830 | WO02062861 | WO03061606 | - WASSON ET AL., "New Aspects of the Setting of Glass-ionomer Cements", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, (199302), vol. 72, no. 2, pages 481 - 483, XP000603070 | - Z. OUYANG ET AL., APPL. SPECTROS, (1999), vol. 53, pages 297 - 301 | - B.M. CULBERTSON; D. XIE; A. THAKUR, J. MACROMOL. SCI. PURE APPL. CHEM. A, (1999), vol. 36, pages 681 - 96 | - D. XIE; B.M. CULBERTSON; G.J. WANG, J. MACROMOL. SCI. PURE APPL. CHEM. A, (1998), vol. 35, page 54761 | - MARSCHÜTZ, M.K.; BERNKOP-SCHNURCH A., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2002), vol. 15, pages 387 - 394 | - MATHIS ET AL., "Properties of a New Glass lonomer/Composite Resin Hybrid Restorative", J. DENT RES., (1987), vol. 66, page 113 | - CRISP ET AL., "Glass ionomer cement formulations. II. The synthesis of novel polycarboxylic acids", J. DENT. RES., (1980), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1055 - 1063 | - PROSSER, J., CHEM. TECH. BIOTECHNOL., (1979), vol. 29, pages 69 - 87 | - M. K. MARSCHÜTZ; A. BERNKOP-SCHURCH, EUROP. J. PHARM. SCI., (2002), vol. 15, pages 387 - 394 |