EP2228576 - Valve device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefer, Thomas Friedrich-Züfle-Weg 26 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
Ghimpu-Mundinger, Radu Stohrerstrasse 8 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003421.6 | 10.03.2009 | [2010/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228576 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228576 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/08, F16K31/42, F16K11/07 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
F16K31/084 (EP);
F16K31/426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | Ventileinrichtung | [2010/37] | English: | Valve device | [2010/37] | French: | Dispositif de soupape | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HR | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IE | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | MK | 08.12.2010 | MT | 08.12.2010 | NL | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | NO | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | LU | 10.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
HU | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 10.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 10.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 10.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1475930 (BECKETT HARCUM COMPANY) [X] 1,5,13-15* column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 31; figure - *; | [XY]DE2729482 (HERION WERKE KG) [X] 1-15 * page 4 - page 6; figure . * [Y] 16; | [Y]EP1069318 (SMC CORP [JP]) [Y] 16 * abstract *; | [E]EP2080942 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-6,12-15 * figure - * | by applicant | EP1760376 |