EP2105725 - Microchip testing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2011/29] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Ushiodenki Kabushiki Kaisha 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku 100 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Yoshimasa Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyasu, Katsuoki Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Okumura, Yoshihiko Ushio Inc. 1194, Sazuchi Bessho-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003481.0 | 10.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080080715 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008080715 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105725 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/25, G01J1/08, G01J3/10, B01L3/00, F21V29/02, H05K9/00 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
G01N21/255 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,KR,US);
B01L9/527 (EP,KR,US);
G01J1/08 (EP,KR,US);
G01J2001/0276 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2035/00158 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Prüfvorrichtung für Mikrochips | [2009/40] | English: | Microchip testing device | [2009/40] | French: | Dispositif de test à micropuces | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1862792 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] , [0012] - [0014] - [0019] , [0042] - [0047] - [0055] - [0065] - [0081]; figures 1-3,6(A),7 *; | [DY]JP2005245473 (PENTAX CORP) [DY] 1,5-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US5397966 (VRIONIS NICKOLAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, lines 39-49 * * column 2, lines 3-32 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, lines 35-64; figure 2A *; | [Y]US5343370 (OHASHI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [DA]JP2007225479 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2007225479 | JP2005245473 |