EP2083124 - Load support apparatus for cabin of heavy equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment Holding Sweden AB 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Chun Jin 202-1405 Hyundai 2nd Apt. 4-1 Banlim-dong Changwon / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
Yoon, Chun Jin 202-1405 Hxundai 2nd Apt. 4-1 Banlim-dong Changwon / KR | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstraße 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003513.0 | 12.12.2005 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | KR20050046889 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050046889 | KR20050096992 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050096992 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083124 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/16, B62D33/06, F16B33/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B62D33/0604 (EP,US);
E02F9/08 (KR);
E02F9/10 (KR);
E02F9/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/31] | Title | German: | Lastträgervorrichtung für Kabinen von Schwermaschinen | [2009/31] | English: | Load support apparatus for cabin of heavy equipment | [2009/31] | French: | Appareil de support de charge pour cabine d'équipement lourd | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05027113.9 / EP1728930 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050027113) is 26.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0544232 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2001193103 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH05239849 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH05263439 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 2 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US1599775 (CHARLES LAMB, et al) [Y] 4,6 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2003111281 (JO CHUN HO [KR], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * |