EP2065885 - Multichannel audio decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Mark, Franklin c/o Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Hoffmann, Eckart Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003671.6 | 28.02.2005 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | US20040549368P | 01.03.2004 Original published format: US 549368 P | US20040579974P | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 579974 P | US20040588256P | 14.07.2004 Original published format: US 588256 P | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065885 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2065885 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00, H04S3/02, H04S5/00 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,BR,KR,US);
G10L19/06 (US);
G10L19/005 (US);
G10L19/018 (US);
G10L19/02 (KR,US);
G10L19/0204 (BR,US);
G10L19/025 (US);
G10L19/26 (BR,US);
H04S3/02 (BR,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | Mehrkanal-Audiodekodierung | [2009/23] | English: | Multichannel audio decoding | [2009/23] | French: | Décodage audio multicanaux | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05724000.4 / EP1721312 | EP08001529.0 / EP1914722 | Divisional application(s) | EP10165531.4 / EP2224430 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | CH | 28.02.2011 | IE | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | LU | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
LU | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002015505 (KATZ ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 47 * * page 4, paragraph 68 * * page 4, paragraph 77 *; | [A]WO03069954 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 25 - line 31 * * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * page 3, line 31 - line 34 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 6, line 15 - line 18 ** page 9, line 30 - line 33 *; | [A]WO03090208 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * claim 5 * * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 20 * | by applicant | US3846719 | US4799260 | US4922535 | US4941177 | US5046098 | US5172415 | US5274740 | US5394473 | US5400433 | US5428687 | US5504819 | US5583962 | US5625696 | US5633981 | US5644640 | US5727119 | US5909664 | US6021386 | USRE36714E | WO0141504 | WO0219768 | WO02097792 | WO03090208 | WO2004019656 | US2004125960 | US6807528 | - M.R. SCHROEDER; B.F. LOGAN, "Colorless' Artificial Reverberation", IRE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, (1961), vol. AU-9, pages 209 - 214 | - M.R. SCHROEDER, "Natural Sounding Artificial Reverberation", JOURNAL A.ES, (196207), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 219 - 223 | US20000532711 | WO2002US03619 | US20030362786 | US20030467213 | WO2003US24570 | US20030478538 | US20060522515 |