EP2104381 - Method and apparatuses of receiving a disaster warning message using a system information radio network temporary identifier SI-RNTI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/39] | Method of receiving a disaster warning message using a radio network temporary identifier RNTI | ||
[2018/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [2018/41] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Young-Dae LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | 02 /
Park, Sung-Jun LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | 03 /
Yi, Seung-June LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do, 431-749 / KR | 04 /
Chun, Sung-Duck LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | [2018/41] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Lee, Young-Dae LG R&D Complex,533,Hogye 1-dong,Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Sung-Jun LG R&D Complex, 533,Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | |||
03 /
Yi, Seung-June LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do, 431-749 / KR | |||
04 /
Chun, Sung-Duck LG R&D Complex 533, Hogye 1-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do, 431-749 / KR | |||
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Lee, Young-Dae 533, Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Sung-Jun 533, Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Yi, Seung-June 533, Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
04 /
Chun, Sung-Duck 533, Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/41] |
Former [2009/39] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003898.5 | 18.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | US20080037681P | 18.03.2008 Original published format: US 37681 P | US20080038035P | 19.03.2008 Original published format: US 38035 P | US20080073748P | 18.06.2008 Original published format: US 73748 P | KR20090022685 | 17.03.2009 Original published format: KR 20090022685 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104381 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2104381 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104381 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/50, H04W4/12, H04W4/90 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | H04W4/22, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/41] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Empfangen einer Katastrophenwarnmeldung unter Verwendung einer temporären Systeminformationskennung SI-RNTI in einem Mobilfunknetz | [2018/21] | English: | Method and apparatuses of receiving a disaster warning message using a system information radio network temporary identifier SI-RNTI | [2018/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositifs de réception d'un message d'avertissement de sinistre utilisant un identificateur temporaire d'informations de système SI-RNTI dans un système de communication mobile | [2018/21] |
Former [2009/39] | Verfahren zum Empfangen einer Katastrophenwarnmeldung unter Verwendung einer temporären Kennung RNTI in einem Mobilfunknetz | ||
Former [2009/39] | Method of receiving a disaster warning message using a radio network temporary identifier RNTI | ||
Former [2009/39] | Procédé de réception d'un message d'avertissement de sinistre utilisant un identificateur temporaire RNTI dans un système de communication mobile | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 10.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | GB | 18.03.2019 | IE | 18.03.2019 | LU | 18.03.2019 | MT | 18.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 18.03.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 18.03.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 18.03.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
MT | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 18.03.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 18.03.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.03.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005037728 (BINZEL CHARLES P [US], et al) [Y] 10-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] * * paragraph [0013] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9805176 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [Y] 10-14 * page 9, lines 7-12 *; | [A] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects;Earthquake and Tsunami Warning System (ETWS)Requirements; Stage 1(Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; TS 22.168 V1.2.1(CLEAN), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080131), vol. SA WG3, no. Sanya; 20080225, pages 1 - 12, XP050280536 [A] 10-14 * paragraph 3.1 * * paragraph 4.2 * * paragraph 5.1 * * paragraph 5.6 * * figures 1, 2 * | Examination | - "Transmission of dynamic system information", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-075559, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071210), vol. RAN WG2, no. Vienna, Austria; 20071210, XP050142099 |