EP2103868 - Vehicle headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 8-3 Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD 8-3 Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Satoshi c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka-Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Yamamura, Satoshi c/o Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. Shizuoka-Plant, 500, Kitawaki, Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka / JP | ||
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Yamamura, Satoshi KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD Shizuoka-Plant, 500, Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004044.5 | 20.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | JP20080074438 | 21.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008074438 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103868 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103868 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103868 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/12, F21V14/08, // F21W101/10 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1423 (EP,US);
F21S41/141 (US);
F21S41/686 (EP);
B60Q2300/056 (EP);
B60Q2300/42 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/24] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugscheinwerfer | [2009/39] | English: | Vehicle headlamp | [2009/39] | French: | Phare de véhicule | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 01.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10248445 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19501173 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]DE102004025433 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [E]WO2009039882 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE], et al) [E] 1-5 * figure - * |