EP2105975 - Resin sheet for encapsulating optical semiconductor element and optical semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suehiro, Ichiro c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Akazawa, Kouji c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Usui, Hideyuki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004125.2 | 23.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080078352 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008078352 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105975 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L21/56 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L33/483 (EP,US);
H01L33/52 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Harzfolie zur Verkapselung optischer Halbleiterelemente und optisches Halbleiterbauelement | [2009/40] | English: | Resin sheet for encapsulating optical semiconductor element and optical semiconductor device | [2009/40] | French: | Feuille de résine pour encapsuler un élément optique semi-conducteur et dispositif semi-conducteur optique | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006157722 (TAKEZAWA HATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0107]; figures 1-16 *; | [A]WO2007139098 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1,5-9 *; | [PA]EP2023413 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1,5-9 *; | [A]US2004145044 (SUGAYA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0684648 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 11, line 29 - column 29, line 49; figures 1-24 *; | [A]US2004160750 (MASUKO SHINGO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0057]; figures 3-11 *; | [A]US2002187570 (FUKASAWA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1538681 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2005223216 |