EP2233128 - Cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moussou, Philippe 6, allée Jean-Babtiste Clément 54510 Tomblaine / FR | 02 /
Freis, Olga 10, avenue des Heléux 54280 Seichamps / FR | 03 /
Danoux, Louis 12, rue de Bretagne 54420 Saulxures les Nancy / FR | 04 /
Grisoni, Philippe 14 rue Hector Berlioz 54420 Saulxures les Nancy / FR | 05 /
Bailly, Laurent 2 bis Avenue Kleber 54270 Essey les Nancy / FR | [2010/39] | Application number, filing date | 09004221.9 | 25.03.2009 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233128 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/365, A61K8/42, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08, A61K8/19 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/34 (KR);
A61K8/362 (KR,US);
A61K8/375 (KR);
A61K8/44 (KR);
A61Q19/00 (KR,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/782 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/22] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [2010/39] | English: | Cosmetic composition | [2010/39] | French: | Composition cosmétique | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5851782 (HANNUN YUSUF A [US], et al) [X] 7 * page 12, column 5, lines 3-22; figure 6D * [A] 1-6,8; | [A]FR2885802 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, lines 4-16 - page 27, lines 1-30 *; | [A]US2004043047 (DUMAS MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0014]; claims 1,4,6,14 *; | [A]EP0764017 (CELLEGY PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * claim 17 *; | [A]WO0200185 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 35; claims 1,3 *; | [A] - W.SUN ET AL., "Upregulation of the Human Alkaline Ceramidase 1 and Acid Ceramidase Mediates Calcium-Induced Differentiation of Epidermal Keratinocytes", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, vol. 2008, no. 128, (20070823), pages 389 - 397, URL: http://www.nature.com/jid/journal/v128/n2/pdf/5701025a.pdf, (20090925), XP002547556 [A] 1-8 * abstract *; page 5, column 1, lines 3,4 - column 2, lines 7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.JID.5701025 | [A] - LISETTE H. CORNELISSEN, "Mechanisms that play a role in the maintenance of the calcium gradient in the epidermis", SKIN RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 2007, no. 13, (2007), pages 369 - 376, URL: http://www3.interscience.wiley.com/cgi-bin/fulltext/118541530/PDFSTART, (20090925), XP002547557 [A] 1-8 * page 1, column 2, lines 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1600-0846.2007.00239.X | by applicant | WO2004017901 | US5296476 | EP0588498 | WO2005018596 | WO2005055927 | WO2006000992 | JP2791179B | US2719811 | US5851782 | WO0209687 | - CASTIEL-HIGOUNEC; M. CHOPART; C. FERRARIS, HUILES, CORPS GRAS ET PRODUIS COSM6TIQUES, (2004), vol. 11, pages 401 - 6 | - K. R. FEINGOLD, JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 48, pages 2531 - 46 | - GHADIALLY; 1995 ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 95, pages 2281 - 90 | - Y OHNISHI ET AL., CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 6, pages 101 - 4 | - R. LOCHHEAD, COSM. TOIL., (1993), vol. 108, page 95 |