EP2105508 - Dry analytical element for pancreatic lipase measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Jun c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Nobuhito c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 11-46, Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Kentaro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 11-46, Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 04 /
Kageyama, Shigeki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Arakawa, Jun c/o FUJUFILM Corporation 577, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Masuda, Nobuhito c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 11-46, Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Kentaro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 11-46, Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Kageyama, Shigeki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / DE | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004297.9 | 25.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080077542 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008077542 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105508 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105508 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/44, G01N33/52 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/44 (EP,US);
G01N2333/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | Analytisches Trockenelement zur Pankreaslipasemessung | [2009/40] | English: | Dry analytical element for pancreatic lipase measurement | [2009/40] | French: | Élément analytique sec pour mesure de la lipase pancréatique | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 10.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2010 | BE | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | DK | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | HR | 09.06.2010 | HU | 09.06.2010 | IT | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | MT | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | PT | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | NO | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | ES | 20.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
HU | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PT | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PT | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PT | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PT | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
MT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HR | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2619219 (STRASBOURG I LOUIS PASTEUR UNI [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 21 * * scheme; page 4 ** page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 2 *; | [DA]JPH04316500 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [DA] 1-17 * WPI abstract *; | [DA]JP2002125699 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DA] 1-17 * WPI abstract * | by applicant | JPS4953888 | JPS54156079 | JPS5590859 | JPS55164356 | US4258001 | JPS56142454U | JPS5763452 | JPS5766359 | JPS5832350U | JPS5870163 | JPS58501144 | JPS58171864 | JPS5948098 | US4486537 | JPS60108753 | JPS60222769 | EP0166365 | JPS614959 | JPS62116258 | JPS62138756 | JPS62138757 | JPS62138758 | EP0226465 | JPS63245672 | JPH01172753 | JPH04316500 | JPH09154598 | JP2002125699 | - CLIN. CHEM., (1991), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 447 - 451 | - R. J. GLEDHILL, J. PHYS. CHEM., (1962), vol. 66, page 458 |