EP2105321 - Wheel bearing assembly, and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamikawa, Tsuyoshi JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Masanobu JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Murao, Satoru JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2013/12] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Kamikawa, Tsuyoshi JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamaguchi, Masanobu JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Murao, Satoru JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [2013/12] |
Former [2009/40] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004376.1 | 26.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080086737 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008086737 | JP20080087093 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008087093 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105321 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105321 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, F16C35/063, F16D1/08, F16D1/10, F16D3/223 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
B60B27/0094 (EP,US);
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B60B27/0026 (EP,US);
B60B27/0031 (EP,US);
B60B27/0042 (EP,US);
F16C35/063 (EP,US);
F16D1/076 (EP);
F16D1/0858 (EP,US);
F16D1/10 (US);
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22326 (EP,US);
F16D2300/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49636 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7033 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | B60B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radlagereinheit und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/40] | English: | Wheel bearing assembly, and manufacturing method thereof | [2009/40] | French: | Ensemble de roulement de roue et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6146022 (SAHASHI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [AP]DE102007016427 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [AP] 1-16 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4230639 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, lines 42 - 58; figures 1, 4 *; | [A]US2003064817 (HACKER ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS57178903 | JPS62194903 |