EP2071331 - Biosensors with porous chromatographic membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i-SENS, INC. 447-1 Wolgye-dong, Nowon-ku 139-701 Seoul / KR | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cui, Gang 19 Cho, Shinheungkamyoengwhiwi Younkil-si, Killimsung / CN | 02 /
Yoo, Jae-Hyun 316-42, Haengdang dong Sungdong-ku Seoul 133-072 / KR | 03 /
Woo, Byung Wook 319-808 Jukong Apt. Sanggye 6-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-206 / KR | 04 /
Oh, Hyun Joon 6-1507 Hanshin 2 Cha Apt. 451, Sanggye 5-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-903 / KR | 05 /
Nam, Hakhyun 101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1, Beon 3-dong Kangbuk-ku Seoul 142-063 / KR | 06 /
Cha, Geun Sig 10/9, 5-305 Keumkang Park Village 170, Pyeongchang-dong Chongro-ku Seoul 110-012 / KR | 07 /
Kim, Moon Hwan Ma-501 Dongwon Apt. 363, Kogangbon-dong Ojung-ku Buchun-si 421-190, Kyunggido / KR | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Cui, Gang 16 Cho, Shinheungkamyoengwhiwi Younkil-si, Killimsung / CN | ||
02 /
Yoo, Jae-Hyun 316-42, Haengdang dong Sungdong-ku Seoul 133-072 / KR | |||
03 /
Woo, Byung Wook 319-808 Jukong Apt. Sanggye 6-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-206 / KR | |||
04 /
Oh, Hyun Joon 6-1507 Hanshin 2 Cha Apt. 451, Sanggye 5-dong Nowon-ku Seoul 139-903 / KR | |||
05 /
Nam, Hakhyun 101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1, Beon 3-dong Kangbuk-ku Seoul 142-063 / KR | |||
06 /
Cha, Geun Sig 10/9, 5-305 Keumkang Park Village 170, Pyeongchang-dong Chongro-ku Seoul 110-012 / KR | |||
07 /
Kim, Moon Hwan Ma-501 Dongwon Apt. 363, Kogangbon-dong Ojung-ku Buchun-si 421-190 Kyunggido / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2013/42] | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09004694.7 | 19.07.2001 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | KR20000041962 | 21.07.2000 Original published format: KR 20000041962 | KR20010027117 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: KR 20010027117 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071331 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071331 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071331 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N33/48, G01N33/49, G01N33/50, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/26, G01N27/30, G01N27/403 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
G01N30/90 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Biosensoren mit porösen chromatographischen Membranen | [2009/25] | English: | Biosensors with porous chromatographic membranes | [2009/25] | French: | Biodétecteurs avec des membranes chromatographiques poreuses | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01306225.2 / EP1182456 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010306225) is 11.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9005910 (I STAT CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-8B *; | [A]WO9204868 (WONG DAVID K [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 10, line 10 - page 17, line 9 *; | [A]WO9945387 (HELLER E & CO [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0974840 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 20 - line 40 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 26 *; | [AD] - GANG C. ET AL, "A disposable amperometric sensor screen printed on a Nitrocellulose Strip: A Glucose Biosensor Employing Lead Oxide as an Interference-Removing Agent", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000415), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 1925 - 1929, XP002223448 [AD] 1,3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac991213d | [A] - NOVOTNY I., BRETERNITZ V. ET AL, "Thin Film Micrelectrode Arrays For Electrochemical Biosensors", 44TH INTERNATIONAL SCIENTIFIC COLLOQUIUM TECHNICAL UNIVERSITY OF ILMENAU, (19990920), XP002223449 [A] 1,3 * the whole document * | [A] - YOON H J ET AL, "Solid-state ion sensors with a liquid junction-free polymer membrane-based reference electrode for blood analysis", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (200006), vol. 64, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 8 - 14, XP004199278 [A] 1,3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(99)00476-1 | by applicant | WO0000827 | - CUI, G. ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 72, pages 1925 - 1929 | - FARM, M. L.; RORAD, O. H.; PARK, H., INTERNATIONAL PAT. | US19990381788 |