EP2110902 - Apparatus for side fire fiber lasers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OFS Fitel, LLC 2000 Northeast Expressway Suite 2H02 Norcross GA 30071 / US | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicholson, Jeffrey W. 13 Taft Lane Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | 02 /
Westbrook, Paul 874 Sherwood Road Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2013/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004741.6 | 31.03.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | US20080105652 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: US 105652 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2110902 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2110902 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110902 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/067 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
H01S3/06708 (EP,US);
H01S3/0675 (EP,US);
H01S3/06791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/01] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für seitlich feuernde Faserlaser | [2009/43] | English: | Apparatus for side fire fiber lasers | [2009/43] | French: | Appareil pour lasers à fibre à feu latéral | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 30.10.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2016 | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2017 | 31.03.2018 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5243609 (HUBER DAVID R [US]) [A] 9-23 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5511083 (D AMATO FRANCIS X [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10,15 * abstract * * column 6, lines 34-43 * [I] 4,5,8,11-14,16-23; | [A]US5546481 (MELTZ GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US6041070 (KOCH THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6498799 (SHEVY YAAKOV [US], et al) [A] 9-23 * the whole document *; | [A] - G. GHISLOTTI ET AL, "Bidirectional pumping of Er-Doped Fibers Uisng Detuned 980 nm Lasers", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20020501), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 780 - 782, XP002737254 [A] 1,5,9,12,15,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2002.1003091 | [AD] - WESTBROOK P S ET AL, "In-line polarimeter using blazed fiber gratings", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20001001), vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1109/68.883827, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1352 - 1354, XP011432054 [AD] 1,9,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.883827 | by applicant | US6211957 | - WESTBROOK P.S. ET AL., PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE, (200010), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 1352 - 1354 |