EP2116966 - System for voice-controlled, interactive support for maintenance work or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisser, Harald Träufleweg 2 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen-Marbach / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004885.1 | 02.04.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | DE20081022158 | 05.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008022158 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116966 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G10L15/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G10L15/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur sprachgesteuerten, interaktiven Unterstützung bei Wartungsarbeiten oder dergleichen | [2009/46] | English: | System for voice-controlled, interactive support for maintenance work or similar | [2009/46] | French: | Système de soutien guidé par la voix, interactif lors de travaux d'entretien ou analogues | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0063763 (SIEMENS ELECTROCOM LP [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 1 - line 19 * * page 4, line 30 - line 31 * * page 5, line 5 - line 30 * * page 12, line 21 - line 30 * * page 14, line 9 - line 12 * * page 42, line 15 - page 43, line 9 * * page 43, line 13 - line 29 * * page 45, line 22 - page 46, line 17 *; | [A]US5781913 (FELSENSTEIN LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 6 - column 8 *; | [A]DE19911535 (PUNKT GES FUER SOFTWARE MBH S [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]WO03060879 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 15 - line 23 *; | [A]EP0670537 (NEWMAN EDWARD GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2 * * abstract * | by applicant | DE10008755 | DE10116539 | WO0241069 | DE10153511 | DE20107967U | DE20107966U |