EP2108615 - Assembly for guiding a dispensing line through a beverage dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carlsberg Breweries A/S Ny Carlsberg Vej 100 1760 Copenhagen V / DK | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasmussen, Jan Nørrager Rytterbakken 22 3650 Ølstykke / DK | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester Søgade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 09004949.5 | 10.08.2006 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | DK20050001144 | 12.08.2005 Original published format: DK 200501144 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108615 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2108615 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108615 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D1/08 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
B67D1/0868 (EP,US);
B67D1/04 (KR);
B67D1/0462 (EP,US);
B67D1/08 (KR);
B67D1/0878 (EP,US);
B67D1/0891 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Extension states | AL | 07.10.2010 | BA | 07.10.2010 | HR | 07.10.2010 | MK | 07.10.2010 | RS | 07.10.2010 | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Führen einer Ausgabeleitung durch eine Getränkeausgabevorrichtung | [2009/42] | English: | Assembly for guiding a dispensing line through a beverage dispenser | [2009/42] | French: | Ensemble de guidage d'un circuit de distribution dans un distributeur de boissons | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2011 | 19.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06761849.6 / EP1937584 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060761849) is 23.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2006 | AT | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 10.08.2012 | LU | 10.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8102002 (BOSTROEM G, et al)[A] 1; | [A]WO0192144 (HEINEKEN TECH SERVICES [NL], et al) [A] 1 |