EP2110853 - Assembly in pressure contact with a high power semiconductor module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reusser, Lars Rinningstrasse 4 96114 Hirschaid / DE | 02 /
Lederer, Marco Kindingerstrasse 23 90453 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/43] | Application number, filing date | 09005275.4 | 11.04.2009 | [2009/43] | Priority number, date | DE20081018793 | 15.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008018793 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2110853 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2110853 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/07 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
H01L23/48 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2924/16195 (EP);
H01R13/2435 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung in Druckkontaktausführung mit einem Leistungshalbleitermodul | [2009/43] | English: | Assembly in pressure contact with a high power semiconductor module | [2009/43] | French: | Agencement dans une conception de contact sous pression avec un module semi-conducteur de puissance | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10306643 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10127947 (SEMIKRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19630173 | DE19903875 | DE10306643 |