EP2111948 - Electric hand tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabowerke GmbH Metabo-Allee 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Will, Manuel Schlossgartenstrasse 19 72793 Pfullingen / DE | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Raunecker, Klaus Peter, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Raunecker, Klaus Peter, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Friz, Oliver, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005553.4 | 21.04.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | DE20081022277 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008022277 | [2009/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111948 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111948 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/00, B23Q11/00, B25F5/00 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
B24B23/00 (EP);
B23Q11/0035 (EP);
B25F5/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Elektrohandwerkzeuggerät | [2009/44] | English: | Electric hand tool | [2009/44] | French: | Machine-outil électrique manuelle | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2009 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MK | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | NO | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
NO | 29.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB832048 (GEORG SCHAFER, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE3209162 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 5-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3722629 (METABOWERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0806268 (ATLAS COPCO TOOLS AB [SE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH11125311 (HITACHI SEIKO KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO03002889 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 7; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE10357145 |