EP2135754 - Tire noise reduction device and pneumatic tire having the same mounted thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuramori, Akira c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
Tanno, Atsushi c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
Kuramori, Akira The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanno, Atsushi The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006018.7 | 30.04.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | JP20080161664 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161664 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135754 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135754 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
B60C19/002 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Reifenlärmverringerungsvorrichtung und Luftreifen versehen mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2009/52] | English: | Tire noise reduction device and pneumatic tire having the same mounted thereon | [2009/52] | French: | Dispositif de réduction sonore de pneu et pneu doté de celui-ci | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | IE | 30.04.2012 | LU | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | FR | 29.05.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | NO | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
LU | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 29.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 29.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 29.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 29.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 29.05.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
NO | 28.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004168212 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006118198 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figures 1-3,10-14 * * abstract *; | [XP]JP2008254658 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [XP] 1,8,9* abstract * | by applicant | JP2006306285 |