EP2113917 - Optical pickup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/45] | Optical pickup and optical disc apparatus | ||
[2010/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaoka, Hiromasa Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Fumiaki Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006025.2 | 30.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | JP20080119649 | 01.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008119649 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113917 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113917 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085, G11B21/02 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
G11B7/08582 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Optischer Lesekopf | [2010/25] | English: | Optical pickup | [2010/25] | French: | Appareil de capture optique | [2010/25] |
Former [2009/45] | Optischer Lesekopf und optische Plattenvorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/45] | Optical pickup and optical disc apparatus | ||
Former [2009/45] | Appareil de disque optique et de capture optique | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HR | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MK | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | NO | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IE | 30.04.2011 | LU | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.04.2011 | ||
LU | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.04.2011 | ||
LU | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 19.01.2011 | |
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6058098 (KATO KAZUNARI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002312956 (KENWOOD CORP) [A] 1-5* figure 9 *; | [A]US2003235139 (TAKEUCHI MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005259254 (KENWOOD CORP) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US2006174254 (TAKASAWA TAKEHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2007280463 |