EP2083271 - Composite arrays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Ilumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. Suite 200, 9390 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chee, Mark S. 325 Arroyo Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
Auger, Steven R. 17 Lantern lane Cohasset, MA 02025 / US | 03 /
Steulpnagel, John R. 38 Briggs Avenue Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Chee, Mark S. 115-15th Street No. 24 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | ||
02 /
Auger, Steven R. 17 Lantern lane Cohasset, MA 02025 / US | |||
03 /
Steulpnagel, John R. 38 Briggs Avenue Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
Chee, Mark S. 115-15th Street No. 24 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | ||
02 /
Auger, Steven R. 12966 Carmel Creek Road No. 140 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
03 /
Steulpnagel, John R. 38 Briggs Avenue Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | Representative(s) | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09006216.7 | 28.12.1999 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | US19980113968P | 28.12.1998 Original published format: US 113968 P | US19990256943 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: US 256943 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2083271 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2083271 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, C12Q1/68 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00382 (EP,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00648 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (EP,US);
Y10S977/924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/31] | Title | German: | KOMPOSITMATRIX | [2009/33] | English: | Composite arrays | [2009/31] | French: | JEUX ORDONNES D ECHANTILLONS COMPOSITES | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/31] | Verbundstoffanordnungen | ||
Former [2009/31] | Réseaux composites | Examination procedure | 01.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/04] | 15.12.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.05.2015 | 21.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05010428.0 / EP1593967 | EP99967670.3 / EP1141712 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990967670) is 09.09.2003 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5545531 (RAVA RICHARD P [US], et al) [X] 1-15 *abstract, column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 67, column 7, lines 56-65, column 9, lines 9-32*; | [A]WO9727326 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO9850782 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9015070 | WO9726539 | WO9820019 | - GEYSEN H ET AL, "Strategies for epitope analysis using peptide synthesis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0022-1759(87)90085-8, ISSN 0022-1759, (19870924), pages 259 - 274, (19870924), XP023975234 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(87)90085-8 | by applicant | US4469863 | US5034506 | US5216141 | US5235033 | US5244636 | US5250264 | US5270163 | US5386023 | US5445934 | WO9525116 | US5475096 | WO9535505 | US5545531 | US5567588 | US5595877 | US5602240 | US5637684 | US5637459 | US5644048 | US5683867 | US5700637 | US5705337 | US5807522 | - MILANOVICH ET AL., "Novel Optical Fiber Techniques For Medical Application", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE 28TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL SYMPOSIUM ON OPTICS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS, (1980), vol. 494 | - SEITZ, W.R., "Chemical Sensors Based On Immobilized Indicators and Fiber Optics", CRC. CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 19, pages 135 - 173 | - ANGEL, S.M., SPECTROSCOPY, (1987), vol. 2, no. 4, page 38 | - WALT ET AL., Chemical Sensors and Microinstrumentation, ACS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (1989), vol. 403, page 252 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1993), vol. 49, no. 10, page 1925 | - LETSINGER, J.ORG. CHEM., (1970), vol. 35, page 3800 | - SPRINZL ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1977), vol. 81, page 579 | - LETSINGER ET AL., NUCL.. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 3487 | - SAWAI ET AL., CHEM. LETT., (1984), page 805 | - LETSINGER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, page 4470 | - PAUWELS ET AL., CHEMICA SCRIPTA, (1986), vol. 26, page 141 | - MAG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 1437 | - BRIU ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, page 2321 | - ECKSTEIN, Oligonucleotides and Analogues: A Practical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS | - EGHOLM, J. AM. CHEM. SOC, (1992), vol. 114, page 1895 | - MEIER ET AL., CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1992), vol. 31, page 1008 | - NIELSEN, NATURE, (1993), vol. 365, page 566 | - CARLSSON ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, page 207 | - DENPCY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, page 6097 | - KIEDROWSHI ET AL., ANQEW. CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGLISH, (1991), vol. 30, page 423 | - LETSINGER ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1994), vol. 13, page 1597 | - Carbohydrate Modifications in Antisense Research | - MESMAEKER ET AL., BIOORQANIC & MEDICINAL CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, page 395 | - JEFFS ET AL., J. BIOMOLECULAR NMR, (1994), vol. 34, page 17 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1996), vol. 37, page 743 | - JENKINS ET AL., CHEM. SOC. REV., (1995), pages 169 - 176 | - Pierce Catalog and Handbook, pages 155 - 200 | - TORCHILIN ET AL., CRITICAL REV. THERAPEUTIC DRUQ CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1991), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 275 - 308 | - SLINKIN ET AL., BIOCONI. CHEM., (1991), vol. 2, pages 342 - 348 | - TRUBETSKOY ET AL., BIOCONI. CHEM., (1992), vol. 3, pages 323 - 327 | - KING ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 6176 - 6185 | - WILBUR ET AL., BIOCONIUQATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 220 - 235 | - WANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, page 1077 | - SCHAFER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 33 - 39 | US19950519062 | US19970818199 | US19970851203 | US19970944850 | WO1998US05025 | WO1998US09163 | US19980151877 | WO1998US21193 | US19980187289 | WO1999US04473 | US19990315584 | WO1999US14387 | WO1999US20914 | US19990160027 | US19990161148 | US19990425633 |