EP2202362 - Method for manufacturing a slotted wall on the ground [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUER Maschinen GmbH Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerressen, Franz, Werner Konrad-Kuhn-Strasse 51 a 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | 02 /
Wenzl, Patrick, Alexander, Florian, Dr. Mathildenstrasse 9 86152 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Stötzer, Erwin, Emil Am Plattenberg 11 86551 Aichach / DE | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006541.8 | 14.05.2009 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202362 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02D19/18, E02D17/13 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
E02D17/13 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B28/10 (EP);
C04B28/14 (EP);
E02D19/18 (EP);
E02F3/205 (EP);
E02F5/08 (EP);
E02F5/101 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B18/08, C04B18/125, C04B18/141, C04B22/064 (EP);
C04B28/10, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B18/06, C04B18/125, C04B18/141, C04B22/064 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B12/04, C04B14/104, C04B18/06, C04B18/125, C04B18/141, C04B22/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Schlitzwand im Boden | [2010/26] | English: | Method for manufacturing a slotted wall on the ground | [2010/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une paroi présentant des fentes au sol | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 02.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1452645 (BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]JPH11200404 (HAZAMA GUMI) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1632609 (BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] *; | [A]DE4440691 (LAUSITZER BRAUNKOHLE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 68 *; | [A]EP1748110 (SOILMEC SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4141629 | DE19530827 | EP1452645 | JPH09273150 |