EP2085884 - Serverless distributed file system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adya, Atul 14590 NE 35th Street D204 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | 02 /
Bolosky, William, J. 24622 SE Mirrormont Drive Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | 03 /
Cermak, Gerald 8908 NE 141st Street Bothel, WA 98011 / US | 04 /
Douceur, John, R. 14705 NE 16th Street Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 05 /
Theimer, Marvin, M. 4440 137th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 06 /
Wattenhofer, Robert, P. unknown 8006 Zürich / CH | [2010/20] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
Adya, Atul 14590 NE 35th Street D204 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | ||
02 /
Bolosky, William, J. 24622 SE Mirrormont Drive Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | |||
03 /
Cermak, Gerald 8908 NE 141st Street Bothel, WA 98011 / US | |||
04 /
Douceur, John, R. 14705 NE 16th Street Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
05 /
Theimer, Marvin, M. 4440 137th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
06 /
Wattenhofer, Robert, P. unknown unknown / CH | |||
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
Adya, Atul 14590 NE 35th Street D204 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | ||
02 /
Bolosky, William, J. 24622 SE Mirrormont Drive Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | |||
03 /
Cermak, Gerald 8908 NE 141st Street Bothel, WA 98011 / US | |||
04 /
Douceur, John, R. 14705 NE 16th Street Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
05 /
Theimer, Marvin, M. 4440 137th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
06 /
Wattenhofer, Robert, P. Clausiusstrasse 35 8006 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006551.7 | 12.03.2002 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | US20010005629 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: US 5629 | US20010278905P | 26.03.2001 Original published format: US 278905 P | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2085884 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2085884 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085884 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20, G06F17/30, H04L29/06 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
G06F16/134 (EP,US);
G06F16/1774 (EP,US);
G06F16/957 (EP,US);
G06F2201/825 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Verteiltes Dateiensystem ohne Server | [2009/32] | English: | Serverless distributed file system | [2009/32] | French: | Système de fichiers répartis sans serveur | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02005657.8 / EP1246061 | EP07011973.0 / EP1830272 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | BE | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6026474 (CARTER JOHN B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 23 - line 60 * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 23 - line 40 * * column 11, line 15 - column 13, line 20 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6032216 (SCHMUCK FRANK B [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 26 - line 52 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 24 * * column 14, line 37 - line 57 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 45 * * column 17, line 37 - line 61 * * column 30, line 27 - column 31, line 15 * * column 32, line 13 - column 33, line 57 * * column 34, line 23 - line 35 * * column 35, line 3 - line 44 * * column 37, line 18 - column 38, line 27 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * * tables 5,6 * | by applicant | US6026474 | US6032216 |