EP2103284 - Expandable medical device for delivery of beneficial agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2016/51] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shanley, John, F. 130 Emerald Estates Court Emerald Hills, CA 94062 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Shanley, John, F. c/o Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2009/39] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006627.5 | 21.09.2001 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | US20000688092 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: US 688092 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103284 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103284 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/90 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (KR);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61L27/04 (KR);
A61L27/54 (KR);
A61M29/02 (KR);
A61F2/0077 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0068 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Expandierbare medizinische Vorrichtung zur Freisetzung eines Heilmittels | [2009/39] | English: | Expandable medical device for delivery of beneficial agent | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif médical extensible destiné à l'apport d'un agent utile | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 23.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01975296.3 / EP1328213 | EP05013944.3 / EP1582180 | EP08003370.7 / EP1935380 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010975296) is 27.05.2004 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.03.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | LU | 21.09.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2018/34] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9949928 (SHANLEY JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 13, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 24, paragraph L - page 25, paragraph 1 ** figures 3E,4A *; | [XI]EP0950386 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-9,11,14-15 * paragraph [0034] * * figure 2A * * column 8, line 2 - line 12 * [I] 2-3,10; | [X]US5972027 (JOHNSON MICHAEL W [US]) [X] 1 * figures 2,5 *; | [A]US6096070 (RAGHEB ANTHONY O [US], et al) [A] 12-13 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 13 * * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 11 * * column 16, line 32 - column 17, line 4 * * column 20, line 6 - line 14 * * figures 8-10D *; | [E]EP1772114 (BOSTON SCIENT LTD [BB]) [E] 1-3 * figure 1 * | Examination | WO0232347 | by applicant | US4733665 | US4739762 | US4776337 | US4969458 | US5545210 | US19980183555 |