EP2086147 - Simple block space time transmit diversity using multiple spreading codes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation Suite 105 Hagley Building 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Wilmington DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation Suite 105 Hagley Building 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Wilmington DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Younglok 1090 Kingsland Lane Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | 02 /
Zeira, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2014/03] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
Younglok, Kim 1090 Kingsland Lane Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | ||
02 /
Zeira, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006756.2 | 05.12.2001 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | US20000254013P | 07.12.2000 Original published format: US 254013 P | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086147 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2086147 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086147 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2086147 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04L25/02, H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/02 (KR);
H04B7/0697 (EP,US);
H04L1/0618 (EP,US);
H04L1/0631 (EP,US);
H04L25/0202 (EP,US);
H04L25/03866 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Einfache Raum-Zeit-Blocksendediversität unter Verwendung mehrerer Spreizcodes | [2009/32] | English: | Simple block space time transmit diversity using multiple spreading codes | [2009/32] | French: | Diversité de transmission de l'espace-temps de bloc simple utilisant plusieurs codes de diffusion | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 18.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01996123.4 / EP1340334 | EP04015676.2 / EP1463227 | Divisional application(s) | EP14171776.9 / EP2779507 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010996123) is 17.09.2003 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | LU | 05.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | GR | 12.09.2014 | |
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | GR | 12.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0957604 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, paragraph 23 - column 5, paragraph 26 * * column 6, paragraph 33 - paragraph 34 * * figures 2,4 *; | [X]EP0993129 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 15 - page 9, paragraph 18 * * figure 3 *; | [XI]WO0064073 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 26 * * figure 3 * [I] 5,6; | [A] - YE (GEOFFREY) LI ET AL, "Channel Estimation for OFDM Systems with Transmitter Diversity in Mobile Wireless Channels", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (19990301), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8716, XP011054927 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |