EP2107494 - Method for transferring data from a portable data carrier with a contactless interface to a reading device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/41] | Portable data carrier with contactless interface | ||
[2022/52] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/20] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finkenzeller, Klaus Ahornstraße 19 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09007006.1 | 13.12.2006 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | DE20051061660 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061660 | [2009/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107494 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107494 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K7/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP);
G06K19/06206 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K19/07732 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP);
G06K7/10079 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | G06K7/00, G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von Daten von einem tragbaren Datenträger mit einer kontaktlosen Schnittstelle zu einem Lesegerät | [2022/52] | English: | Method for transferring data from a portable data carrier with a contactless interface to a reading device | [2022/52] | French: | Procédé de transfert de données d'un support de données portable à interface sans contact vers un dispositif de lecture | [2022/52] |
Former [2009/41] | Tragbarer Datenträger mit Kontaktlosschnittstelle | ||
Former [2009/41] | Portable data carrier with contactless interface | ||
Former [2009/41] | Support de données portatif doté d'une interface sans contact | Examination procedure | 17.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06025811.8 / EP1801741 | Divisional application(s) | EP11002348.8 / EP2348455 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060025811) is 25.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2815490 (INSIDE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 4 * * page 18, line 7 - page 20, line 25 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO2005073906 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 8, line 2 ** figures 2-5 * | Examination | US2005161508 | - INSIDE CONTACTLESS, "Reader to Reader technology", INTERNET CITATION, (20040730), pages 1 - 30, URL: http://www.smartcard.co.uk/articles/R2R%20Technology%201_0.pdf, (20040730), XP002739685 | by applicant | US6161762 | WO2005073906 |