EP2111863 - Fasudil in combination with bosentan for the treament of pulmonary arterial hypertension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Pharma Corporation 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fong, Benson 2000 Sierra Point Parkway Suite 600 Brisbane, California 94005-1846 / US | [2012/13] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Fong, Benson 2000 Sierra Point Parkway Suite 600 Brisbane, California 94005-1846 / US | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007232.3 | 25.10.2006 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | US20050730273P | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 730273 P | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111863 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111863 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/551, A61K31/506, A61P9/10, A61P9/12 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/401 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61K31/5578 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/22, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/401, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Fasudil in Kombination mit Bosentan zur Behandlung von pulmonaler arterieller Hypertonie | [2009/44] | English: | Fasudil in combination with bosentan for the treament of pulmonary arterial hypertension | [2009/44] | French: | Combinaison du fasudil et bosentan pour le traitement de l'hypertension artérielle pulmonaire | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06826765.7 / EP1951253 | Divisional application(s) | EP11000632.7 / EP2351569 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060826765) is 30.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2006 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | IT | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | IE | 25.10.2012 | LU | 25.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
LU | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
IT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - NAGAOKA TETSUTARO ET AL, "Inhaled Rho kinase inhibitors are potent and selective vasodilators in rat pulmonary hypertension.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE 1 MAR 2005, (20050301), vol. 171, no. 5, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 494 - 499, XP002542152 [Y] 1-5 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.200405-637OC | [Y] - WEITZENBLUM E, "ACTUALITE SUR L'HYPERTENSION ARTERIELLE PULMONAIRE (HTAP) < | [Y] - DASHWOOD M R ET AL, "[3H]bosentan binding to human coronary artery: functional correlates.", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY 1995, (1995), vol. 26 Suppl 3, ISSN 0160-2446, pages S376 - S379, XP009121647 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | HU151865 | US2882271 | US3152173 | GB1025578 | US3261859 | US3262977 | US3267104 | US3371014 | US3485847 | US3562257 | US3773939 | US3799934 | US3962238 | US3985758 | US4154839 | US4220649 | US4264611 | US4338322 | EP0106275 | US4446325 | US4466972 | US4567175 | US4572909 | US4663325 | US4672068 | US4692464 | US4705797 | US4786635 | US4801599 | US4808605 | US4885284 | US4892875 | US4952592 | WO2012065758 | - D'ALONZO, G.E. ET AL., ANN INTERN MED, (1991), vol. 115, pages 343 - 349 | - PALEVSKY, H.I. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1989), vol. 80, pages 1207 - 1221 | - RUBIN, L.J., N ENGL JMED, (1997), vol. 336, pages 111 - 117 | - WAGENVOORT, C.A.; WAGENVOORT, N., CIRCULATION, (1970), vol. 42, pages 1163 - 1184 | - WOOD, P., BR HEART J, (1958), vol. 20, pages 557 - 570 | - GIAID, A.; SALEH, D., N ENGL J MED, (1995), vol. 333, pages 214 - 221 | - XUE, C; JOHNS, R.A., N ENGL J MED, (1995), vol. 333, pages 1642 - 1644 | - ABE K.; 2004 ET AL., CIRC. RES., vol. 94, pages 385 - 393 | - FAGAN K.A. ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL. MOL. PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 287, pages L656 - L664 | - NAGAOKA ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 287, pages L665 - L672 | - NAGAOKA ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2005), vol. 171, pages 494 - 499 | - VAN AELST; D'SOUZA-SCHOREY, GENES DEV., (1997), vol. 11, pages 2295 - 2322 | - SAUZEAU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 21722 - 21729 | - GUDI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 37382 - 37393 | - ROBERTSON ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 131, pages 5 - 9 | - WANG ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 25, pages 628 - 635 | - WILSON ET AL., J CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 123, pages 741 - 747 | - LIU ET AL., CIRC. RES., (2004), vol. 95, pages 579 - 586 | - TAKEMOTO ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 106, pages 57 - 62 | - FAGAN L.A.; 2004 ET AL., AM. J PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., vol. 287, pages L656 - L664 | - NAGAOKA; 2004 ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., vol. 287, pages L665 - L672 | - UEHATA ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 990 - 994 | - NAGAOKA; 2005 ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., vol. 171, pages 494 - 499 | - SHIMOKAWA H. ET AL., CARDIOVASC. RES., (1999), vol. 43, pages 1029 - 1039 | - FUKUMOTO Y. ET AL., HEART, (2005), vol. 91, pages 391 - 392 | - SASAKI ET AL., PHARMACOL THER., (2002), vol. 93, pages 225 - 32 | - SHIMOKAWA; TAKESHITA, THROMB VASE BIOL, (2005), vol. 25, pages X - X | - HIROOKA; SHIMOKAWA, AM J CARDIOVASC DRUGS, (2005), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 31 - 39 | - TRAMONTANO ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMM, (2004), vol. 320, pages 34 - 38 | - OHNAKA ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMM, (2001), vol. 287, pages 337 - 342 | - BARST R.J. ET AL., NENGL JMED, (1996), vol. 334, pages 296 - 301 | - BADESCH D.B. ET AL., ANN INTERN MED, (2000), vol. 132, pages 425 - 434 | - WALMRATH D. ET AL., LANCET, (1993), vol. 342, pages 961 - 962 | - WALMRATH D. ET AL., AM JRESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1995), vol. 151, pages 724 - 730 | - WALMRATH D. ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1996), vol. 153, pages 991 - 996 | - ZWISSLER B. ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1996), vol. 154, pages 1671 - 1677 | - OLSCHEWSKI H. ET AL., AM JRESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1999), vol. 160, pages 600 - 607 | - BARST, R.J., J. AM. COLL. CARDIOL., (2003), vol. 41, pages 2119 - 25 | - ABE K. ET AL., J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL, (2005), vol. 45, pages 120 - 124 | - FITSCHA P. ET AL., ADV PROSTAGLANDIN THRONZBOXANE LEUKOT RES, (1987), vol. 17, pages 450 - 454 | - HOEPER M.M. ET AL., JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2000), vol. 35, pages 176 - 182 | - OLSCHEWSKI H. ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1999), vol. 160, pages 600 - 607 | - OLSCHEWSKI H. ET AL., ANN INTERN MED, (1996), vol. 124, pages 820 - 824 | - GESSLER T. ET AL., EUR RESPIR J, (2001), vol. 17, pages 14 - 19 | - WENSEL R. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 101, pages 2388 - 2392 | - HOEPER M.M. ET AL., N ENGL JMED, (2000), vol. 342, pages 1866 - 1870 | - OLSCHEWSKI H. ET AL., INTENSIVE CARE MED, (1998), vol. 24, pages 631 - 634 | - STRICKER H. ET AL., SCHWEIZ MED WOCHENSCHR, (1999), vol. 129, pages 923 - 927 | - OLSCHEWSKI H. ET AL., ANN INTERN MED, (2000), vol. 132, pages 435 - 443 | - BEGHETTI M. ET AL., HEART, (2001), vol. 86, pages E10 - E10 | - OLSCHEWSKI H ET AL., NEJM, (2002), vol. 345, pages 322 - 9 | - DOGGRELL S.A., EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2004), vol. 13, pages 7865 - 874 | - MYATA M. ET AL., LUNG, (2000), vol. 178, pages 63 - 73 | - MYATA M. ET AL., LUNG, vol. 178, pages 63 - 73 | - HIRONAKA E. ET AL., CARDIOVASC. RES., (2003), vol. 60, pages 692 - 629 | - MYATA M. ET AL., CHEST, (2001), vol. 119, pages 554 - 561 | - SAINI H.K. ET AL., CAARDIOVASC. DRUG REV., (2004), vol. 22, pages 27 - 54 | - SETOGUCHI Y. ET AL., PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 64, pages 71 - 75 | - KATO S. ET AL., RESPIROLOGY, (2000), vol. 5, pages 27 - 32 | - KATO S. ET AL., J.INT. MED. RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 258 - 268 | - KINUGAWA ET AL., AM HEART J, (2002), vol. 144 | - CHANNICK RN. ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 1119 - 1123 | - RUBIN L.J. ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2002), vol. 346, pages 896 - 903 | - NAGAYA N. ET AL., AM JRESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2001), vol. 163, pages 887 - 891 | - MICHELAKIS E. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 105, pages 2398 - 2403 | - GHOFRANI H. ET AL., LANCET, (2002), vol. 360, pages 895 - 900 | - SCHERMULY R..T., J PHANNACOL EXP THER, (2000), vol. 292, pages 512 - 20 | - GHOFRANI ET AL., CRIT CARE MED, (2002), vol. 30, pages 2489 - 92 | - GHOFRANI ET AL., JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2003), vol. 42, pages 158 - 164 | - GHOFRANI ET AL., ANN INTERN MED, (2002), vol. 136, pages 515 - 22 | - OKA M., AM J PHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL, (2001), vol. 280, pages L432 - L435 | - MORIO Y.; MCMURTRY I.F., JAPPL PHYSIOL, (2002), vol. 92, pages 527 - 534 | - KATO ET AL., RESPIROLOGY, (2000), vol. 5, pages 27 - 32 | - KATO ET AL., J INT. MED. RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 258 - 268 | - DOGGRELL, EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2004), vol. 13, pages 7865 - 874 | - SAINI ET AL., CARDIOVASC. DRUG REV., (2004), vol. 22, pages 27 - 54 | - ABE ET AL., J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL, (2005), vol. 45, pages 120 - 124 | - NAGAOKA ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 287, pages L665 - L672 | - FUKUMOTO ET AL., HEART, (2005), vol. 91, pages 391 - 392 | - ABE ET AL., CIRC RES, (2004), vol. 94, pages 385 - 393 | - SHIMOKAWA ET AL., CARDIOVASC. RES., (2005), vol. 43, pages 1029 - 1039 | - HIROOKA ET AL., AM J CARDIOVASC DRUGS, (2005), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 31 - 39 | US20050730273 |