EP2130953 - Epitaxial silicon wafer and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMCO CORPORATION 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimoto, Seiji 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | 02 /
Takaishi, Kazushige 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007408.9 | 04.06.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | JP20080148566 | 05.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008148566 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2130953 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2130953 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/02, C30B25/02, C30B29/06 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
C30B15/02 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
H01L21/322 (KR);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Siliziumscheibe mit Epischicht und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/50] | English: | Epitaxial silicon wafer and method for producing the same | [2009/50] | French: | Tranche de silicium épitaxiée et son procédé de production | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006092932 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,5; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2007089666 (KOIKE YASUO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * examples 1-2; claims 1-2; tables 1-4 *; | [A] - MASAHARU WATANABE AND SCOTT KRAMER, "450 mm Silicon: An Opportunity and Wafer Scaling", INTERFACE, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20061201), ISSN 1064-8208, pages 28 - 31, XP007910968 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH06112120 |