EP2266680 - Amine containing fibrous structure for adsorption of CO2 from atmospheric air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zürich, ETH Transfer Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states ETH Zürich, ETH Transfer Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gebald, Christoph Bülachhof 2-23 8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Wurzbacher, Jan André Staffelstraße 2 8045 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Steinfeld, Aldo Reinerstraße 30 5200 Brugg/AG / CH | [2010/52] | Application number, filing date | 09007467.5 | 05.06.2009 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2266680 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/047, B01J20/22 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/24 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,US);
B01J20/2805 (EP,US);
B01J20/28066 (EP,US);
B01J20/28069 (EP,US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,US);
B01J20/3208 (EP,US);
B01J20/3248 (EP,US);
B01J20/327 (EP,US);
B01J20/3274 (EP,US);
B01J20/3276 (EP,US);
B01J20/3483 (EP,US);
B01D2253/202 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aminhaltige Faserstruktur zur Adsorption von CO2 aus atmosphärischer Luft | [2010/52] | English: | Amine containing fibrous structure for adsorption of CO2 from atmospheric air | [2010/52] | French: | Structure fibreuse contenant des amines pour l'adsorption de CO2 de l'air atmosphérique | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 31.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202008003982U (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0018] , [0130] , [0157] - [0164]; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-9,11-15; | [XI]WO2007016271 (GLOBAL RES TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 3, line 7 - page 3, line 12 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 12; claims 1,7,9,11,13,16,17,52,114 * [I] 2-3,5-8,10-13; | [XI]EP1552871 (HOKUETSU PAPER MILLS [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-4 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; claims 1-4,6,12,1,18 * [I] 2,5-15; | [XI]WO2009067625 (GLOBAL RES TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-4,10 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 16 * * page 16, line 9 - page 16, line 10 * * page 17, line 3 - page 17, line 4; examples 1-7; claims 1,4,7,15,16,18 * [I] 2,5-9,11-15; | [A]US4046525 (MATSUO TATSUKI, et al) [A] 1,10-12 * claims 1,6 * |