EP2134031 - Communication device with a path protection function, and network system using the communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Hitachi Communication Technologies, Ltd. 26-3, Minami Ooi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takase, Masayuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Endo, Hideki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ueta, Taisuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Kanno, Takayuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/51] | Application number, filing date | 09007492.3 | 05.06.2009 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | JP20080150281 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008150281 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134031 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/14, H04L12/18, H04L12/701, H04L12/703, H04L12/707, H04L12/723, H04L12/761 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H04L12/1868 (EP,US);
H04L41/0668 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/16 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | H04L12/24, H04L12/56, H04L29/14, H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationsvorrichtung mit Pfadschutzfunktion und Netzwerksystem mit der Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2009/51] | English: | Communication device with a path protection function, and network system using the communication device | [2009/51] | French: | Dispositif de communication avec une fonction de protection de chemin, et système de réseau utilisant le dispositif de communication | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007201355 (VASSEUR JEAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0035] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008123524 (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILIPPE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] ** paragraphs [0035] - [0048] *; | [Y] - AIGUO FEI; JUNHONG CUI; GERLA M; CAVENDISH D ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "A dual-tree scheme for fault-tolerant multicast", ICC 2001. 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE RECORD. HELSINKY, FINLAND, JUNE 11 - 14, 2001; 20010611; 20010611 - 20010614 NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010611), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-7097-5, pages 690 - 694, XP010553091 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2001.937328 | [Y] - HONGXIA LONG; SUBIN SHEN, "A mechanism for restorable QoS routing", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, 2003. ICCNMC 2003. 2003 INTERN ATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 20-23 OCT. 2003, 20031020 - 20031023 PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031020), ISBN 978-0-7695-2033-9, pages 61 - 67, XP010666115 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCNMC.2003.1243028 | [A] - BALA RAJAGOPALAN; DIMITRIOS PENDARAKIS; DEBANJAN SAHA; RAMU S RAMAMOORTHY; KRISHNA BALA, "IP over Optical Networks: Architectural Aspects", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20000901), vol. 38, no. 9, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 94 - 102, XP011091348 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Introduction; page 94 * * End-to-End Restoration; page 100 * | by applicant | JP2000036818 | US2007201355 | JP2007282153 | - A. FEI ET AL., "A dual-tree scheme for fault-tolerant multicast", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, (20010611), vol. 3, pages 690 - 694 | - H. LONG ET AL., "A mechanism for restorable QoS routing", ICCNMC 2003, 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER NETWORKS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, IEEE, (200310), pages 61 - 67 |