EP2457759 - Convertible vehicle with a folding roof and a roof storage compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Achim Klusstrasse 5 49074 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Dziubiel, Marian Windhorststrasse 15 49084 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
Gödecke, Morten Parkstrasse 37 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 09007498.0 | 06.06.2009 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | DE20081004555 | 03.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008004555 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457759 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/20, B62D37/02 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H01F3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Cabriolet-Fahrzeug mit einem Verdeck und einem Verdeckkastendeckel | [2012/22] | English: | Convertible vehicle with a folding roof and a roof storage compartment | [2012/22] | French: | Cabriolet avec un toit escamotable et un couvercle de coffre de capote | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3623468 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * page 6, line 32 - line 43 *; | [X]US5090764 (KOGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0482681 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [I] 1-3,5,7 * column 2, line 36 - line 39 * * claims 5,6 *; | [I]EP1918146 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | DE10140233 | DE19845178 | DE102007061792 |