EP2093286 - Multi-chain eukaryotic display vectors and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyax Corporation 300 Technology Square, 8th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hufton, Simon, E. 31, Pimlico Road Clitheroe Lanes BB7 2AG / GB | 02 /
Hoogenboom, Hendricus, R., J., M. Hertogsingel 46 6214 AE Maastricht / NL | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Wichmann, Hendrik Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09007767.8 | 30.09.2002 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | US20010326320 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: US 326320 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093286 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093286 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N15/10, C12N15/85, C40B40/02 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/1037 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C40B40/02 (EP,US);
G01N33/554 (US);
C12N2795/00043 (EP,US);
C12N2800/108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Mehrkettige eukaryotische Display-Vektoren und deren Verwendungen | [2009/35] | English: | Multi-chain eukaryotic display vectors and uses thereof | [2009/35] | French: | Vecteurs d'affichage des eucaryotes à plusieurs chaînes et utilisations associées | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02766425.9 / EP1438400 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020766425) is 17.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | IE | 30.09.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/33] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.02.2013 | |
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | BG | 27.05.2013 | |
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BG | 27.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9936569 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,14,17,20,21,24-26 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 2 *; | [X] - PERSIC L ET AL, "An integrated vector system for the eukaryotic expression of antibodies or their fragments after selection from phage display libraries", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970310), vol. 187, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 9 - 18, XP004056106 [X] 7,24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(96)00628-2 | [X] - DEN W ET AL, "A bidirectional phage display vector for the selection and mass transfer of polyclonal antibody libraries", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990101), vol. 222, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 45 - 57, XP004152426 [X] 7,24-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(98)00178-1 | [A] - CHESNUT J D ET AL, "Selective isolation of transiently transfected cells from a mammalian cell population with vectors expressing a membrane anchored single-chain antibody", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960614), vol. 193, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 17 - 27, XP004020799 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(96)00032-4 | [A] - GRABHERR R ET AL, "Developments in the use of baculoviruses for the surface display of complex eukaryotic proteins", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, GB, (20010601), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 231 - 236, XP004239793 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(01)01610-9 | [A] - KIEKE MICHELE C ET AL, "Selection of functional T cell receptor mutants from a yeast surface-display library", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19990511), vol. 96, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5651 - 5656, XP002177390 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.10.5651 | by applicant | US5223409 | WO9418330 | US5658727 | WO9936569 | - "Principles of Gene Manipulation: An Introduction To Genetic Engineering", OLD, R.; PRIMROSE, S., Studies in Microbiology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, vol. 2, page 409 | - Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - WINNACKER, E., From Genes To Clones: Introduction To Gene Technology, VCH PUBLISHERS | - BODER, E.; WITTRUP, K., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1998), vol. 14, pages 55 - 62 | - CHANG, H. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 11408 - 12 | - CRAMERI, R.; BLASER, K., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 110, pages 41 - 45 | - CRAMERI, R.; SUTER, M., GENE, (1993), vol. 137, pages 69 - 75 | - DE HAARD, H. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 18218 - 18230 | - FIELDS, S.; STEMGLANZ, R., TRENDS GENET., (1994), vol. 10, pages 286 - 292 | - GIETZ, D. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 1425 | - HOOGENBOOM, H. ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 62 - 70 | - HORWITZ, A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8678 - 8682 | - KIEKE, M. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1997), vol. 10, pages 1303 - 1310 | - KIEKE, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 5651 - 5656 | - LIU, Q. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2000), vol. 328, pages 530 - 549 | - MOLL, J. ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (2001), vol. 10, pages 649 - 55 | - MUNRO, S.; PELHAM, H., CELL, (1987), vol. 48, page 899 | - PHIZICKY, E.; FIELDS, S., MICROBIOL. REV., (1995), vol. 59, pages 94 - 123 | - PU, W.; STRUHL, K., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 4348 - 55 | - WALHOUT, A. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2000), vol. 328, pages 575 - 593 | US20010326320 |