EP2136338 - Remote identification equipped self-service monetary item handling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bank of America Corporation 101 North Tryon Street Charlotte NC 28255 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nichols, Michelle c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 02 /
Atwood, Todd c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 03 /
Heddleson, James c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 04 /
Garnett, karen c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 05 /
Votaw, Elisabeth S. c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | 06 /
Crowley, Steve c/o Bank of America Corporation 101 S. Tryon Street NC1-002-29-01 Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09007879.1 | 16.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | US20080061987P | 16.06.2008 Original published format: US 61987 P | US20080262529 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 262529 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136338 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G06Q20/00, G06K7/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G07C9/00182 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/389 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/207 (EP,US);
G07F19/211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mit Fernidentifikation ausgestattete Selbstbedienungsgeldhandhabungsvorrichtung | [2009/52] | English: | Remote identification equipped self-service monetary item handling device | [2009/52] | French: | Identification à distance équipée d'un dispositif de gestion d'article monétaire en libre-service | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003234719 (DENISON WILLIAM D [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102004039365 (WINCOR NIXDORF INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0014] , [0024] , [0026] , [0028] - [0030] - [0032] - [0036] *; | [X]WO2005041385 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 20, line 13 - page 21, line 18 *; | [A]DE19846452 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005106722 (DEXIT INC [CA], et al); | [A]US2007226142 (HANNA J R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003234719 | US19870610619 | US20080262529 |