EP2103236 - Capsule extraction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryser, Antoine Rue due Simplon 19 1006 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Boussemart, Chistophe S. 9, route de Champ Poirier 74500 Lugrin / FR | 03 /
Denisart, Jean-Luc Ch. du Vigny 2 1096 Cully / CH | 04 /
Cahen, Antoine Pl. du Nord 2 1005 Lausanne / CH | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Santarelli, Luc, et al Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Santarelli, Luc, et al Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée Boite Postale 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2011/24] | Lewitter, Herbert, et al Santarelli 12 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/39] | Borne, Patrice Daniel Nestec S.A. IP Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 09007962.5 | 21.06.2004 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | EP20030015776 | 10.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03015776 | [2009/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103236 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103236 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
A47J31/40 (KR);
A47J31/407 (US);
A47J31/3638 (EP,US);
A47J31/3676 (US);
A47J31/368 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Extraktion einer Kapsel | [2009/39] | English: | Capsule extraction device | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif pour l'extraction d'une capsule | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 29.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2009 | Observations by third parties | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2010 | Observations by third parties | 28.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2012 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04740112.0 / EP1646305 | EP06124536.1 / EP1757212 | Divisional application(s) | EP10001828.2 / EP2181629 | EP10161542.5 Application withdrawn : 05.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE DEMB Holding B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 02
07.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 03
12.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Ethical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | 04
11.02.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | 05
02.04.2012
10.04.2012
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Casa del Caffè Vergnano S.p.A. S.S. Torino-Asti Km.20 10026 Santena (TO) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE DEMB Holding B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Ethical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
05
02.04.2012
10.04.2012
INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE Casa del Caffè Vergnano S.p.A. S.S. Torino-Asti Km.20 10026 Santena (TO) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2012/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE DEMB Holding B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Ethical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
05
02.04.2012
07.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE Casa del Caffè Vergnano S.p.A. S.S. Torino-Asti Km.20 10026 Santena (TO) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2012/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE B.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Ethical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
05
02.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE Casa del Caffè Vergnano S.p.A. S.S. Torino-Asti Km.20 10026 Santena (TO) / IT Opponent's representative Rondano, Davide Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2012/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE B.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Ethical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
19.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
Former [2011/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Eihical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Beyers Koffie N.V. Koning Leopoldlaan 3 2870 Puurs / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 BE-9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
Former [2011/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Eihical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
04
11.02.2011
N.V. Beyers Koffie/S.A. Cafe Liegeois Koning Leopoldlaan 3/Rue de Verviers 181 2870 PUURS (Breendonk)/4651 Battice / BE Opponent's representative Brants, Johan P.E. Brantsandpatents bvba Guldensporenpark 75 BE-9820 Merelbeke / BE | |||
Former [2011/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
03
12.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ethical Coffee Company ( Suisse ) SA / Eihical Coffee Company SA Rue Faucigny 5 Fribourg / CH Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al, et al August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2011/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
06.07.2010
ADMISSIBLE Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
07.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE Distribution Casino France 1 Esplanade de France 42000 SAINT ETIENNE / FR Opponent's representative Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
Former [2011/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2010
Sara Lee/DE N.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 27.04.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 10.10.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/09] | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 03.09.2012 | Appeal received No. T1674/12 | 14.11.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.06.2012 | Appeal received No. T1674/12 | 13.11.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.07.2012 | Appeal received No. T1674/12 | 09.11.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 12.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0112/12 | 13.04.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.08.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 30.08.2012 | Appeal received No. T1674/12 | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.08.2012 | Appeal received No. T1674/12 | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.06.2012 | Appeal received No. T0112/12 | 21.08.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 09.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.05.2010 | LI | 12.05.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | GB | 05.06.2013 | [2014/21] |
Former [2014/20] | CH | 12.05.2010 | |
LI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 16.06.2010 | |
MC | 30.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5755149 (BLANC JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5776527 (BLANC JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 40; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP1219217 (SGL ITALIA SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 50; figures 2-7 *; | [PA]WO03073897 (CIE MEDITERRANEENNE DES CAFES [FR], et al) [PA] 1* page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 32; figures 15-22 * | by applicant | EP0512148 | EP0512142 | EP0602203 | EP0604615 | US5776527 | WO9847418 | EP1219217 | other | EP0175212 | EP0512148 | EP0602203 |