EP2146021 - Temperable awning assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz-Werke GmbH + Co. KG Hansestrasse 87 48282 Emsdetten / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wessels, Bernhard Stickenhover 27 48432 Rheine 11 / DE | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Hübner, Gerd, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Hübner, Gerd, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008350.2 | 26.06.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | DE20081033784 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008033784 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146021 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/04, F24F5/00, // E04F10/06 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
E04F10/0614 (EP);
E04F10/0607 (EP);
E04F10/0666 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Temperierbare Markisenanordnung | [2010/03] | English: | Temperable awning assembly | [2010/03] | French: | Agencement de marquise pouvant être équilibré en température | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE19904681 | WO2006079234 | US2727366 | DE29913873U |