EP2141055 - Safety valve for a pneumatic gearbox control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilberer, Eduard Am Damm 5 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008441.9 | 29.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | DE20081031328 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008031328 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141055 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2141055 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141055 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00, B60T17/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B60T17/002 (EP);
B60T17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsventil für eine pneumatische Getriebesteuerung | [2010/01] | English: | Safety valve for a pneumatic gearbox control | [2010/01] | French: | Soupape de sécurité pour une commande d'engrenage pneumatique | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 23.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2009 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MK | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | IE | 29.06.2013 | LU | 29.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | NO | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MK | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 12.06.2013 | |
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 12.06.2013 | |
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0112488 (ALLIEDSIGNAL TRUCK BRAKE SYST [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004103509 (WABCO AUTOMOTIVE UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1495934 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document * |