EP2140924 - Compressed air supply device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiss-Esser, Daniel Wimmerstrasse 7 81927 München / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2010/01] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008442.7 | 29.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | DE20081031326 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008031326 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2140924 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2140924 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140924 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/26, B60T17/00, F15B21/00, F15B21/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F15B21/048 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
B01D53/261 (EP);
B60T17/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckluftversorgungseinrichtung | [2010/01] | English: | Compressed air supply device | [2010/01] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en air comprimé | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | AT | 29.06.2015 | IE | 29.06.2015 | LU | 29.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5595588 (BLEVINS JERRY R [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP0840686 (BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLES SYS [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |