EP2140849 - A tray for collecting and/or treating decomposition fluids from a corpse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiers, David 52c Forest Hill Conlig Newtownards County Down BT23 7FL / GB | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Waller, Stephen, et al FRKelly 4 Mount Charles Belfast, Northern Ireland BT7 1NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Waller, Stephen, et al FRKelly 4 Mount Charles Belfast, Northern Ireland BT7 1NZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09008480.7 | 29.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | GB20080012273 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: GB 0812273 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140849 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140849 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61G17/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61G17/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Tablett zum Sammeln und/oder Behandeln von Zersetzungsflüssigkeiten eines Körpers | [2010/01] | English: | A tray for collecting and/or treating decomposition fluids from a corpse | [2010/01] | French: | Plateau pour collecter et/ou traiter des fluides de décomposition issu d'un corps | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/01] | Plateau pour collecter et/ou traiter des fluides de décomposition à partir d'un corps | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2009 | AT | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | HR | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MK | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | NO | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
HR | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
NO | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2485368 (AUGIAS FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,10-12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0395530 (SOGEA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12 * figures 1,4,6,7 * * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 35 *; | [A]USRE34846E (MAGUIRE KEITH D [US]) [A] 1* column 3, lines 14-30; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | FR2485368 | EP0395530 | EP1783303 |