EP2143847 - Tap with built-in wall box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideal Standard International NV Da Vincilaan, 2 1935 Zaventem / BE | [2016/47] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Ideal Standard International BVBA Corporate Village - Gent Building Da Vincilaan, 2 1935 Zaventem / BE | ||
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Ideal Standard International BVBA Chaussée de Wavre 1789 bte 15 1160 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behr, Josef Flugplatzstr. 20 54516 Wittlich / DE | 02 /
Mertes, Alfred Ringstrasse 24 54528 Salmtal / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008654.7 | 02.07.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | DE20081032185 | 09.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008032185 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2143847 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2143847 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/02 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP);
E03C2001/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sanitärarmatur mit Unterputz-Montageeinheit | [2010/02] | English: | Tap with built-in wall box | [2010/02] | French: | Armature avec unité de montage encastrée dans le mur | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 09.02.2010 | [2010/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE112005002883T (PIP CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008038309 (CRS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE9211967U (X) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19650971 (KRANEN WILLI [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004005161 (GROHE WATER TECH AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004022538 |