EP2271176 - A wave choke system for an oven door of a microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | ||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zbat, Abdel-Ilah Ernst-Reuter-Strasse 20 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Arnd, Dr.-Ing. An der Leite 4 97511 Schallfeld / DE | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Zbat, Abdehl-Ilah Ernst-Reuter-Strasse 20 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
02 /
Hofmann, Arnd, Dr.-Ing. An der Leite 4 97511 Schallfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Dienstleistungs GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/01] | Hochmuth, Jürgen c/o AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008660.4 | 02.07.2009 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271176 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271176 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/76 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
H05B6/763 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | Drosselspulensystem für eine Herdtür eines Mikrowellenherds | [2011/01] | English: | A wave choke system for an oven door of a microwave oven | [2011/01] | French: | Système de support à ondes pour porte de four d'un four à micro-ondes | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2009 | AT | 27.06.2012 | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | IT | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MK | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | SM | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | IE | 02.07.2012 | LU | 02.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SM | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 02.07.2012 | ||
LU | 02.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 02.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 02.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 02.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4523069 (STAATS JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 9,10,9A * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 35 * * column 9, lines 30-44 *; | [A]DE4031893 (BONNET SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 10-59 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1519633 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0032] * |