EP2134100 - Method of producing three dimensional images that can be watched by naked single eye without 3-D-eyeglasses or special display, and 3-D camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Seong-Do Landhausstrasse 17 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Seung-Yeon 22-308, Banpo APT Banpo bon-dong Seocho-gu 137-049 Seoul / KR | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009158.8 | 13.04.2002 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | KR20010020083 | 14.04.2001 Original published format: KR 20010020083 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134100 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134100 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, G03B35/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G03B35/04 (EP,US);
H04N13/211 (EP,US);
H04N13/286 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von dreidimensionalen Bildern, die mit dem bloßen Auge ohne 3-D-Brille oder spezieller Anzeige gesehen werden können, und 3-D-Kamera | [2009/51] | English: | Method of producing three dimensional images that can be watched by naked single eye without 3-D-eyeglasses or special display, and 3-D camera | [2009/51] | French: | Procédé de production d'images tridimensionnelles qui peuvent être consultées par un seul ýil nu sans lunettes 3D ni affichage spécial, et caméra 3D | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 17.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02718673.3 / EP1379909 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/24] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08149518 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5640222 (PAUL EDDIE [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH08149518 | US5640222 |