EP2148049 - Method for removing sulphur from a NOX storage catalytic converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | 27.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruhnke, Andreas Husarenstrasse 23 30163 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Düsterdiek, Thorsten Heimstaettenstrasse 5B 30569 Hannover / DE | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/26] |
Former [2010/04] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael Reinhardt & Pohlmann Patentanwälte Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009324.6 | 17.07.2009 | [2010/04] | Priority number, date | DE20081034992 | 25.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008034992 | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148049 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/023, F01N3/08, F01N9/00 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G03B21/06 (EP);
F01N13/04 (EP);
F01N3/023 (EP);
F01N3/0885 (EP);
F01N9/002 (EP);
F01N2430/06 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entschwefeln eines NOX-Speicherkatalysators | [2010/04] | English: | Method for removing sulphur from a NOX storage catalytic converter | [2010/04] | French: | Procédé de désulfuration d'un catalyseur de stockage de NOX | [2010/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2825412 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 6, line 3 - page 6, line 26; figure - *; | [X]EP1600612 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1,6 *; | [X]US2006070373 (HUANG YIQUN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure - *; | [X] - HADLER J ET AL, "Der neue 2,0-l-TDI-Motor von Volkswagen fuer niedrigste Abgasgrenzwerte - Teil 2", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, VIEWEG VERLAG, WIESBADEN, DE, (20080601), vol. 69, no. 6, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 534 - 539, XP001518702 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006017300 | DE102006034805 | DE19923481 |