EP2145542 - Packaging device and method for controlling same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Westerbachstrasse 45 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freiberger, Gerd Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 27 91275 Auerbach / DE | 02 /
Schmalfeld, Ralf Am Schmacks Kirchberg 13 41379 Brüggen / DE | [2011/20] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Freiberger, Gerd Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 27 91275 Auerbach / DE | ||
02 /
Schmalfeld, Ralf Am Schmacks Kirchweg 13 41379 Brüggen / DE | |||
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Freiberger, Gerd Adolf Kolping Strasse 27 91275 Auerbach / DE | ||
02 /
Schmalfeld, Ralf Am Schmacks Kirchberg 13 41379 Brüggen / DE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009345.1 | 17.07.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | DE20081033800 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008033800 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145542 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145542 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/02, B65B9/12, B65B57/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
A22C11/0254 (EP,US);
A22C11/125 (EP,US);
B65B51/04 (EP,US);
B65B57/005 (EP,US);
B65B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Verpackungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Verpackungsvorrichtung | [2010/03] | English: | Packaging device and method for controlling same | [2010/03] | French: | Dispositif d'emballage et procédé de commande d'un dispositif d'emballage | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 19.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2009 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | IE | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MK | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | SM | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
SM | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4813205 (MIKATA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,8* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [YA]US6117003 (BRINSON EDWARD P [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15; | [YA]EP1763999 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 8 | by applicant | US6117003 | EP1763999 |